PLYMPTON ST MARY'S C OF E INFANT SCHOOL PARENTS STAFF ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1084161
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Organising and running fundraising events for parents and pupils, including school discos, cakes sales, tombolas and seasonal fairs. Providing and supporting extra resources for the school.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £4,174
Total expenditure: £3,994

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Education/training
  • Amateur Sport
  • Recreation
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Services
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Plymouth City

Governance

Registration history:
  • 19 December 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • Friends of St Marys School (FoSMs) (Working name)
  • PLYMPTON ST MARYS PSA (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Risk management
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Sarah Shelton Chair 01 September 2018
OLD PRIORY JUNIOR SCHOOL PTFA
Charity reporting is overdue by 315 days
Laura Jane Parker Trustee 01 September 2022
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £20.40k £3.79k £5.15k £5.84k £4.17k
Total expenditure £12.64k £11.21k £7.75k £6.91k £3.99k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 02 February 2025 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 17 June 2024 138 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 30 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 21 February 2022 21 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2020 04 February 2022 369 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
Friends of St Marys School
Plympton St Mary's CE Infant School
8 Market Road
Plympton
Plymouth
PL7 1QW
Phone:
07921081424
Website:

No information available