FRIENDS OF CHERNOBYL'S CHILDREN HUCKNALL BRANCH
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Assisting children affected by the effects of the Chernobyl nuclear fallout by offering respite care in the UK.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Nottinghamshire
Governance
- 04 August 2000: Standard registration
- 09 May 2010: Removed (Does not operate)
- 12 October 2010: Standard registration
- 16 January 2025: Removed (Does not operate)
- 16 January 2025: Funds transferred to 1049689 FRIENDS OF CHERNOBYL'S CHILDREN (UK)
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.45k | £1.54k | £3 | £55 | £5 | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.87k | £1.06k | £0 | £103 | £60 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 28 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 26 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 16 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 08 June 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 13 OCTOBER 1999 AS AMENDED 4 SEPTEMBER 2000 AND 31 JANUARY 2001.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE CHILDREN FROM THE BELARUS REGION IN RUSSIA BY THE PROVISION OF CARE AND WELFARE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM FOR CHILDREN IN CONDITIONS OF NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS, THE RELIEF OF SICKNESS, THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND THE SUPPLY AND TRANSPORT OF HUMANITARIAN AID FOR THOSE IN CHARITABLE NEED
Area of benefit
BELARUS REGION IN RUSSIA
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window