MANCHESTER HISTORIC BUILDINGS TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The current activity is the maintenance and operation as a heritage attraction of 84 Plymouth Grove, Manchester, the home of Mrs Elizabeth Gaskell. The house is open to the public and runs a programme of activities and events.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 October 2023
People

10 Trustee(s)
60 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Bolton
- Bury
- Manchester City
- Oldham
- Rochdale
- Salford City
- Stockport
- Tameside
- Trafford
- Wigan
Governance
- 08 May 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Alex Walker | Chair | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rana Wulan Rofifah | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rose Palmer | Trustee | 28 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Hannah Jane Riches | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Shanna Liane McGoldrick | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Madeleine Carnwath | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Liza Jane Leonard | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Katharine Rodwell | Trustee | 06 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Diane Duffy | Trustee | 08 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Jane Baxter | Trustee | 29 April 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/10/2019 | 31/10/2020 | 31/10/2021 | 31/10/2022 | 31/10/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £192.24k | £191.59k | £239.22k | £189.34k | £145.04k | |
|
Total expenditure | £169.39k | £161.85k | £188.44k | £188.41k | £204.39k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £44.88k | £58.29k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2023 | 28 August 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2022 | 30 August 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2021 | 09 June 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2020 | 15 July 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 October 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 October 2019 | 18 August 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 JUNE 1998 as amended on 19 Sep 2020 as amended on 12 Oct 2020
Charitable objects
3.a The objects of the Charity are to preserve for the benefit of the people Manchester and of the Nation, the historical, architectural and constructional heritage associated with 84 Plymouth Grove ,Manchester ( ‘The House’) the former home of William and Elizabeth Gaskell (including any structure or erection, and any part of the building as so defined ) and to advance the education of the public in the said heritage and to undertake such other charitable activities as may benefit the people of or visitors to the said County of Greater Manchester. 3.b To acquire, preserve, document, interpret and make accessible exhibits, objects and collections relating to the literary, social and historical impact and influence of Elizabeth Gaskell and her family through provision of a museum service for the purpose of educating and informing the public. (“The Objects”)
Area of benefit
GREATER MANCHESTER
Contact information
- Address:
-
Elizabeth Gaskell's House
84
Plymouth Grove
Manchester
- Phone:
- 01619273123
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window