HALESWORTH ANGEL BOWLS CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bowls is enjoyed by both sexes encompassing all age groups and is available to people with disabilities. Equipment and tuition is available to learners and recruitment is concentrated on the 8 to 18 age group. Younger players learn the discipline of being a team player and all members can participate in county and national competitions. Members also use the pavilion for social activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
People

5 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Suffolk
Governance
- 22 September 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Trevor James Flatt | Chair |
|
||||||
Benjamin Cardwell | Trustee | 02 September 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rosemary Lewis | Trustee | 28 October 2022 |
|
|||||
RON DAVIS | Trustee | 01 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
DAVID HARVEY MORETON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.10k | £6.26k | £4.45k | £3.89k | £9.83k | |
|
Total expenditure | £5.60k | £5.07k | £4.56k | £5.51k | £8.51k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 25 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 31 May 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 24 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 14 April 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 19 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3/09/00 AND AMENDED 9 NOVEMBER 2005
Charitable objects
TO PROVIDE A BOWLS CLUB IN HALESWORTH, SUFFOLK, IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE AND FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC. THE CLUB IS PROVIDED WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THOSE PERSONS IN NEED OF THE FACILITIES.
Area of benefit
HALESWORTH, SUFFOLK
Contact information
- Address:
-
Halesworth Angel Bowls Club
Dairy Hill
Halesworth
Suffolk
IP19 8JS
- Phone:
- 01986 835779
- Email:
- roms.lewis@hotmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window