Financial history ASHWELL VILLAGE HALL PROJECT

Charity number: 1084359
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £28.02k £24.13k £24.32k £26.82k £33.15k
Total expenditure £23.61k £19.26k £30.68k £28.69k £25.08k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.00k N/A N/A N/A