UNDERHILL JUNIOR SCHOOL PARENT TEACHER ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1080532
Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Parent Teachers Association. Raising money for educational purposes at Underhill School

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 August 2022

Total income: £7,397
Total expenditure: £4,566

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
Where the charity operates:
  • Barnet

Governance

Registration history:
  • 03 May 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

2 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Jennie Reed Trustee 21 September 2021
None on record
Nicola Hayles Trustee 01 September 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2018 31/08/2019 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022
Total gross income £9.27k £5.77k £8.74k £92 £7.40k
Total expenditure £6.44k £11.28k £6.23k £873 £4.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2023 Overdue Charity reporting is overdue by 312 days
Annual return 31 August 2022 22 June 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2021 29 June 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2020 21 September 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 August 2019 27 February 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 August 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
UNDERHILL SCHOOL
MAYS LANE
BARNET
HERTFORDSHIRE
EN5 2LZ
Phone:
02084492423