HEARTLAND YOUTH FOR CHRIST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Heartland Youth for Christ work regularly with young people in Coalville and the surrounding area, providing games, activities, opportunities to develop socially, information about Christianity and one-to-one support. This is done through a variety of approaches including work with schools, FE colleges and churches, running youth clubs, after-school clubs, drop-in sessions and mentoring.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

4 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Religious Activities
- Children/young People
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Leicestershire
Governance
- 21 August 2000: Standard registration
- WEST LEICESTERSHIRE YOUTH FOR CHRIST (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
4 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andrew Glenn York | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
NIGEL JOHN ROBERTS | Trustee | 13 May 2023 |
|
|
||||
Dr Juliet Elizabeth Hogsden PhD ACA | Trustee | 10 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
ANDREW HOGSDEN | Trustee | 10 May 2013 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.05k | £30.06k | £22.15k | £25.43k | £22.35k | |
|
Total expenditure | £37.85k | £40.74k | £31.92k | £21.28k | £13.95k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £5.91k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 27 May 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 26 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 27 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 27 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 18 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 3 AUGUST 2000 AS AMENDED 2 OCTOBER 2004
Charitable objects
(A) TO PROMOTE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH AND TO PROCLAIM THE GOSPEL OF THE LORD JESUS CHRIST THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN THAT PART OF THE NORTH WEST LEICESTERSHIRE DISTRICT BEING CONTAINED BY THE A447, THE A512, AND THE M1, OR WITHIN A REASONABLE DISTANCE THEREFROM AS DECIDED BY THE DIRECTOR AND TRUSTEES B) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE THE CHRISTIAN EVANGELISATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE THROUGHOUT THE WORLD AND IN PARTICULAR (BUT WITHOUT PREJUDICE TO THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING) IN THAT PART OF THE NORTH WEST LEICESTERSHIRE DISTRICT BEING CONTAINED BY THE A447, THE A512, AND THE M1 OR WITHIN A REASONABLE DISTANCE THEREFROM AS DECIDED BY THE DIRECTOR AND TRUSTEES (C) TO PROMOTE AND ENCOURAGE POSITIVE CHRISTIAN LIVING (D) TO RELIEVE POVERTY AND SICKNESS THEREBY DEMONSTRATING THE GOSPEL OF JESUS CHRIST
Area of benefit
THAT PART OF THE NORTH WEST LEICESTERSHIRE DISTRICT BEING CONTAINED BY THE A447, THE A512, AND THE M1, OR WITHIN A REASONABLE DISTANCE THEREFROM AS DECIDED BY THE DIRECTOR ETC
Contact information
- Address:
-
23 Margaret Street
COALVILLE
Leicestershire
LE67 3LY
- Phone:
- 07732500616
- Email:
- heartland@yfc.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window