Financial history UPPER WHARFEDALE FELL RESCUE ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1083459
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £65.68k £171.11k £99.16k £79.51k £97.98k
Total expenditure £77.42k £77.97k £86.92k £81.44k £110.12k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k N/A N/A N/A £4.00k