Financial history BOLTON CARERS SUPPORT

Charity number: 1082166
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £287.23k £285.09k £280.31k £352.62k £380.79k
Total expenditure £296.35k £274.94k £277.63k £352.37k £393.29k
Income from government contracts £68.27k £68.27k £69.63k £71.03k N/A
Income from government grants £30.00k £30.00k £30.60k £31.21k £124.43k