BOLTON CARERS SUPPORT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Bolton Carers Support provides support for local carers over the age of 18 who look after a family member who is elderly, ill or disabled. Support is provided through the following: a carers helpline; information and advice appointments; short breaks; training; benefits advice; newsletter and factsheets. Hidden carers are identified through outreach work and work with GP practices.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £124,428 from 2 government grant(s)
People

10 Trustee(s)
34 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Bolton
Governance
- 25 August 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
10 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
David Ruane | Chair | 26 May 2021 |
|
|
||||
Ian Bury | Trustee | 04 March 2025 |
|
|
||||
Yvonne Seal | Trustee | 25 June 2024 |
|
|
||||
Melanie Bainbridge | Trustee | 17 October 2023 |
|
|
||||
Tracy Lee | Trustee | 20 July 2021 |
|
|
||||
Frances Ayleen Benischke | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Simon Thompson | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|||||
Caroline Hilton | Trustee | 31 October 2018 |
|
|
||||
Susan Foster | Trustee | 07 February 2018 |
|
|
||||
Harry Mistry | Trustee | 17 October 2017 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £287.23k | £285.09k | £280.31k | £352.62k | £380.79k | |
|
Total expenditure | £296.35k | £274.94k | £277.63k | £352.37k | £393.29k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £68.27k | £68.27k | £69.63k | £71.03k | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £30.00k | £30.00k | £30.60k | £31.21k | £124.43k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 09 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 26 March 2024 | 55 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 10 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 02 February 2021 | 2 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 5 APRIL 2000 as amended on 24 Oct 2022
Charitable objects
TO PURSUE ANY CHARITABLE PURPOSE TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC ABOUT THE ISSUES FACING CARERS AND THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY THEM, TO PROVIDE INFORMATION, SUPPORT AND SERVICES TO CARERS AND FORMER CARERS LIVING OR CARING FOR SOMEONE IN THE METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF BOLTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Area of benefit
METROPOLITAN BOROUGH OF BOLTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
Bolton Carers Support
The Thicketford Centre
Thicketford Road
Bolton
BL2 2LW
- Phone:
- 01204363056
- Email:
- info@boltoncarers.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window