WELLSPRING COMMUNITY CHURCH BRISTOL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Supporting Wellspring Community Church. We help run activities for our local community such as a community cafe and open the book in three schools. We give to charities in the UK and abroad.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 August 2022
People

7 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Overseas Aid/famine Relief
- Religious Activities
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Services
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 02 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CHRISTINE CLOTHIER | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Michael Bond | Trustee | 25 September 2016 |
|
|
||||
Sheren Wyatt | Trustee | 26 October 2014 |
|
|
||||
RUTH GRAY | Trustee | 19 March 2013 |
|
|
||||
Angeline Hawkins | Trustee | 17 October 2011 |
|
|
||||
BERYL BOND | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RICHARD VENN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2018 | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 30/08/2022 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £5.24k | £5.06k | £1.18k | £225 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.47k | £5.95k | £3.22k | £11.02k | £1.63k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 306 days | |
Annual return | 30 August 2022 | 10 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 August 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 23 February 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 12 February 2022 | 104 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 25 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 14 APRIL 2000.
Charitable objects
1. THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE CHRISTIAN FAITH THROUGHOUT THE WORLD BY ANY CHARITABLE MEANS WHATSOEVER INCLUDING BUT WITHOUT LIMITING THE GENERALITY OF THE FOREGOING 2. BY PREACHING AND PROCLAMATION OF THE CHRISTIAN GOSPEL 3. BY THE TEACHING OF CHRISTIAN DOCTRINES AND PRINCIPLES 4. BY ADVANCING THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF CHRISTIAN PEOPLE 5. BY THE FINANCIAL, SPIRITUAL AND PRACTICAL SUPPORT OF PASTORS, EVANGELISTS, APOSTLES, MISSIONARIES, OTHER CHRISTIAN WORKERS AND ORGANISATIONS 6. THE ADVANCEMENT FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT OF RELIGIOUS OR OTHER EDUCATION 7. THE RELIEF OF PERSONS WHO ARE IN NEED, HARDSHIP, DISTRESS OR SICKNESS 8. TO ADMINISTER ANY PROPERTY OR ESTATE INTENDED FOR ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR WORK 9. TO SUPPORT BY CONTRIBUTION LOAN GIFT SUBSCRIPTION OR OTHERWISE ANY RELIGIOUS OR OTHER CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR WORK WHICH SHALL BE ESTABLISHED OR MAINTAINED FOR ANY OF THE PRECEDING PURPOSES 10. TO DO ALL OTHER LAWFUL THINGS AS SHALL FURTHER THE CHARITABLE OBJECTS OF THE TRUST.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED. IN PRACTICE WORLDWIDE
Contact information
- Address:
-
4 West Town Grove
BRISTOL
BS4 5EQ
- Phone:
- 07912684547
- Email:
- NICKANG1@LIVE.COM
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window