PILL SOCIAL CENTRE COMMUNITY ASSOCIATION

Charity number: 1080880
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

To provide a community hall for use of local people, charities and community groups. The Welsh Blood Service use the hall. There are several independent groups using the hall for full details please go to www.pillsocialcentre.org.uk

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £32,586
Total expenditure: £19,589

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

This charity does not have any trading subsidiaries.

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
  • Disability
  • Arts/culture/heritage/science
  • Recreation
  • Other Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
  • Elderly/old People
  • People With Disabilities
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • Other Defined Groups
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
  • Other Charitable Activities
Where the charity operates:
  • Pembrokeshire

Governance

Registration history:
  • 25 May 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:
  • PILL SOCIAL CENTRE (Working name)
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

4 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
COLIN SHARP Chair 09 August 2011
MILFORD HAVEN UNIT 564 OF THE SEA CADET CORPS
Received: On time
Teresa Evans Trustee 24 October 2021
None on record
Emma Picton Trustee 23 April 2018
None on record
Rosemary Picton Trustee 01 November 2017
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £62.71k £63.31k £41.38k £32.59k £32.59k
Total expenditure £54.68k £44.90k £33.70k £19.59k £19.59k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants £10.00k £54.95k £24.00k N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 26 September 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 26 September 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 14 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 14 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 05 January 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 22 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 22 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 15 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020

(These accounts
have been qualified)

15 October 2020 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Linked charities

Linked charities
Governing document
CONVEYANCE DATED 24 MAY 1950.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE SAID PROPERTY HEREBY CONVEYED UPON CHARITABLE TRUSTS FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE PILL DISTRICT OF MILFORD HAVEN AND SUBJECT TO AND WITHIN THE LIMITS OF THAT PRIMARY AND OVERRIDING TRUST THE TRUSTEES SHALL:- A) PERMIT THE SAID LAND TO BE USED BY THE ASSOCIATION KNOWN AS THE PILL SOCIAL SERVICE CENTRE AS A SITE FOR THE ERECTION THEREON OR ON PART THEREOF OF BUILDINGS FOR USE AS A COMMUNITY CENTRE BY THE INHABITANTS OF THE COOMBES PILL AND BEACH HILL HOUSING ESTATES OF THE COUNCIL AND THE INHABITANTS OF THE PILL DISTRICT IN GENERAL IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE RULES AND REGULATIONS OF THE SAID ASSOCIATION, AND B) PERMIT THE SAID LAND AND THE SAID BUILDINGS WHEN ERECTED TO BE USED IN PERPETUITY FOR THE PURPOSE OF SUCH A COMMUNITY CENTRE AS AFORESAID.
Area of benefit
PILL DISTRICT.
Registration history
  • 25 May 2000 : Standard registration

Contact information

Address:
Pill Social Centre
Cellar Hill
MILFORD HAVEN
Dyfed
SA73 2QT
Phone:
07960842196