LIFELINE COMMUNITY PROJECTS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
As one of the larger community-based social enterprises in London, LifeLine Community Projects are engaged in 1) mentoring young people; 2) supporting children and families; 3) community development/combating isolation; 4) employability and skills; 5) offering alternative provision education; 6) FaithAction: empowering faith-based and community grass roots organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£3,190,707
Donations and legacies | £1.98m | |
Charitable activities | £1.15m | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £40.98k | |
Other | £21.17k |
Total expenditure:
£2,911,093
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £2.91m | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £1,595,457 from 22 government contract(s) and £11,438 from 2 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £0 | |
Charitable expenditure | £2.91m | |
Retained for future use | £279.61k |
People

78 Employee(s)
5 Trustee(s)
54 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
Number of employees | |
---|---|
£60k to £70k | 1 |
£70k to £80k | 2 |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Other Charitable Activities
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 22 January 2001: Standard registration
- LIFELINE (Working name)
- Ofsted (Office For Standards In Education)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Neil Andrew Jaques | Chair | 05 March 2014 |
|
|
||||
Ruth King | Trustee | 29 April 2025 |
|
|
||||
Christos William Kapnisis | Trustee | 30 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Henry Yung | Trustee | 01 September 2022 |
|
|
||||
Rev. Dr. Terry Lee King | Trustee | 31 December 2020 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.12m | £2.18m | £2.50m | £2.62m | £3.19m | |
|
Total expenditure | £2.74m | £2.04m | £3.97m | £2.69m | £2.91m | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £1.39m | £1.31m | £1.60m | |
|
Income from government grants | £1.86m | N/A | N/A | N/A | £11.44k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | £1.93m | £1.35m | £1.44m | £1.59m | £1.98m | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | £1.05m | £697.59k | £831.14k | £1.01m | £1.15m | |
|
Income - Endowments | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | £94.39k | £71.45k | £47.36k | £7.31k | £40.98k | |
|
Income - Other | £36.88k | £51.25k | £182.14k | £16.07k | £21.17k | |
|
Income - Legacies | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | £2.26m | £2.04m | £2.06m | £2.69m | £2.91m | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | £11.78k | £18.67k | £13.70k | £0 | £15.37k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | £487.93k | £0 | £1.91m | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | £996.90k | £967.22k | £862.68k | £1.07m | £1.10m | |
|
Long-term investments | £994.00k | £994.00k | £0 | £1 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | £1.79m | £2.11m | £1.42m | £1.65m | £2.18m | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | £480.88k | £633.10k | £565.20k | £1.08m | £1.37m |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 29 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 04 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 20/03/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 07/01/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 30/10/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 25/06/2014
Charitable objects
IN LONDON, ESSEX AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT AND WITH THE INTENTION OF PROMOTING AND FURTHERING SOCIAL COHESION:- (A) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION INCLUDING (THOUGH NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF NURSERY FACILITIES, ENGLISH LANGUAGE TEACHING FOR THOSE FOR WHOM ENGLISH IS NOT A FIRST LANGUAGE, MARRIAGE AND PARENTING COURSES, AND PERSONAL AND SOCIAL DEVELOPMENT EDUCATION FOR YOUNG PERSONS; (B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS IN NEED, HARDSHIP OR DISTRESS INCLUDING (THOUGH NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF MATERIAL ASSISTANCE, ADVICE AND ADVOCACY, AND TRAINING FOR THOSE PERSONS IN NEED OF SUCH ASSISTANCE; (C) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH INCLUDING (THOUGH NOT BY WAY OF LIMITATION) THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COUNSELLING AND TRAINING WITH THE AIM OF MAINTAINING AND PROMOTING CHRISTIAN MARRIAGE AND PARENTING VALUES; (D) TO PROMOTE CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC IN THE FOLLOWING WAYS: (1) THE PRESERVATION AND PROTECTION OF HEALTH; (11) THE PROVISION OF FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS; AND (111) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING WITH THE OBJECT OF RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT.
Area of benefit
LONDON, ESSEX AND ELSEWHERE IN THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD
Contact information
- Address:
-
LIFELINE HOUSE
25 NEVILLE ROAD
DAGENHAM
ESSEX
RM8 3QS
- Phone:
- 02085972900
- Email:
- info@lifelineprojects.co.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window