GENNA ETHIOPIAN ARTS AND THEATRE

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Organises workshops and activities in drama, film, music, visual art, mime and Amharic literature for all age groups
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Children/young People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Throughout London
Governance
- 27 March 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints handling
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
WENDWOSEN ABEBE | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Tigist Desalegne | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Henok Fekadu Tilahun | Trustee | 12 March 2023 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £114 | £114 | £114 | £114 | £114 | |
|
Total expenditure | £50 | £0 | £0 | £20 | £0 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 29 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 11 September 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 30 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 02 March 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 26 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26TH OCTOBER 2000
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF YOUNG PEOPLE IN BRITAIN, WITH PREFERENCE FOR THOSE OF ETHIOPIAN DESCENT BY THE ENCOURAGEMENT OF THE ARTS INCLUDING THE ARTS OF DRAMA, MIME, SINGING AND MUSIC IN ORDER TO:- (1) INCREASE KNOWLEDGE OF ETHIOPIAN CULTURE IN BRITAIN; (11) NURTURE AND DEVELOP ARTISTIC TALENT.
Area of benefit
BRITAIN
Contact information
- Address:
-
Flat 74
Rosebery Square East
Rosebery Avenue
London
EC1R 4PT
- Phone:
- 07429442684
- Email:
- gennaeat97@yahoo.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window