Financial history S.P. CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1082164
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £12.75k £22.75k £12.75k £16.50k £24.57k
Total expenditure £14.30k £11.94k £19.23k £17.36k £18.49k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A