DORSET RACIAL EQUALITY COUNCIL
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Information on the charity's activities is not available.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2004
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bournemouth
- Dorset
- Poole
Governance
- 24 October 2000: Standard registration
- 17 February 2006: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 17 February 2006: Funds transferred to 1104642 DORSET RACE EQUALITY COUNCIL
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2004 | ||
---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £64.85k | |
|
Total expenditure | £114.10k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2005 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2005 | 26 January 2006 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2004 | 07 April 2005 | 66 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2004 | 05 July 2004 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
AMENDED CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 18 JULY 2000.
Charitable objects
1) TO WORK TOWARDS THE ELIMINATION OF RACIAL DISCRIMINATION; AND 2) TO PROMOTE EQUALITY OF OPPORTUNITY, AND GOOD RELATIONS, BETWEEN PERSONS OF DIFFERENT RACIAL GROUPS; 3) ESPECIALLY IN THE BOROUGHS/COUNTY OF BOURNEMOUTH, POOLE AND DORSET (HEREINAFTER KNOWN AS THE DORSET REC'S AREA OF BENEFIT).
Area of benefit
BOURNEMOUTH, POOLE AND DORSET
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window