CRANBORNE CHASE SPORTING CHANCE ASSOCIATION

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Annual sporting and recreational activities day provided primarily for adult people with learning disabilities. Provision of activities by regional clubs and associations. Provision of volunteer supporters with special emphasis on youth organisations.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 November 2023
People

1 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Amateur Sport
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Human Resources
- Bournemouth
- Devon
- Dorset
- Hampshire
- Poole
- Somerset
- Wiltshire
Governance
- 22 May 2000: Standard registration
- SPORTING CHANCE (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
1 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
CLAIRE LOUISE LIGHT | Chair |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/11/2019 | 30/11/2020 | 30/11/2021 | 30/11/2022 | 30/11/2023 | |
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Total expenditure | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 November 2023 | 16 July 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2022 | 02 April 2024 | 185 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2021 | 29 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2020 | 11 November 2021 | 42 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 November 2019 | 20 January 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 November 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 1 MARCH 2000.
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS ("THE OBJECTS") TO RELIEVE THE HARDSHIP OF PERSONS WITH LEARNING DIFFICULTIES AND PHYSICAL DISABILITIES AND TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THOSE PERSONS BY PROVIDING FOR AND RUNNING SPORTING EVENTS AND THE PROVISION OF THERAPEUTIC EXERCISE FACILITIES INSTRUCTIONAL DEVELOPMENTAL MATERIAL AND TRAINING
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Barnstorf
Holtwood
Holt
WIMBORNE
BH21 7DX
- Phone:
- 01258840478
- Email:
- DorsetGOLD1@yahoo.co.uk
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window