THE SIR VICTOR BLANK CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Broad range of charitable causes supported to include the areas of education, medicine, religion and the arts.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Children/young People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 19 December 2000: Standard registration
- BLANK CHARITABLE SETTLEMENT (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SIMON MAX BLANK | Trustee | 09 April 2014 |
|
|
||||
SIR MAURICE VICTOR BLANK | Trustee | 10 December 1979 |
|
|||||
LADY SYLVIA HELEN BLANK | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £177.62k | £187.50k | £200.59k | £275.57k | £48.96k | |
|
Total expenditure | £221.56k | £568.68k | £957.60k | £229.48k | £625.93k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 04 February 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 05 February 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 21 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 24 August 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 26 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 10 DECEMBER 1979 AS AMENDED BY DEED OF APPOINTMENT 17 FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE SETTLOR SHALL FROM TIME TO TIME DURING HIS LIFETIME DETERMINE AND SUBJECT TO AND IN DEFAULT OF ANY SUCH DETERMINATION THEN FOR SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES SHALL IN THEIR UNCONTROLLED DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
2nd FLOOR
REGIS HOUSE
45 KING WILLIAM STREET
LONDON
- Phone:
- 02074031877
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window