SAVE CHINA'S TIGERS

Charity number: 1082216
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

"Save China's Tigers" was established to protect and conserve the tiger and other endangered cat species of China, in the knowledge that these are essential for the maintenance of a balanced co-existence with nature.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Total income: £3,520
Total expenditure: £3,574

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
  • Animals
  • Environment/conservation/heritage
  • Economic/community Development/employment
Who the charity helps:
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
  • Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
Where the charity operates:
  • Throughout London
  • China
  • South Africa

Governance

Registration history:
  • 30 August 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:

No other names

Company number:
Gift aid:
Not recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

3 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charles Bradley Nilson Trustee 07 November 2016
None on record
Heinrich Rudolf Funck Trustee 22 August 2016
None on record
MR Kun Shang Trustee 04 June 2015
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £78 £150.10k £233 £32 £3.52k
Total expenditure £10.59k £1.38k £0 £2.23k £3.57k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 30 January 2025 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2023 15 April 2024 75 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2022 06 February 2023 6 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 26 January 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 02 February 2021 2 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
99 KENTON ROAD
HARROW
HA3 0AN
Phone:
07507668248