Accounts and annual returns PEACEWORKS

Charity number: 1082497
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2012 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2012 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2011 16 December 2011 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2011 16 December 2011 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2010 20 December 2010 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2010 17 December 2010 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2009 18 December 2009 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2009 22 December 2009 On Time