Accounts and annual returns RICHARD BERNSTEIN CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity Number: 1081675
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 December 2023 19 January 2025 80 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2022 06 May 2024 188 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2021 01 May 2023 182 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2020 02 January 2022 63 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 December 2019 31 October 2020 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 December 2019 Not Required