LADY EMILY COMMUNITY HALL

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To maintain The Lady Emily Community Hall in Tarrington for the benefit of the three communities Tarrington, Stoke Edith & Dormington.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2024
Total income includes £2,406 from 2 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
9 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Arts/culture/heritage/science
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Herefordshire
Governance
- 19 June 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Hugh MacDonald | Trustee | 14 November 2024 |
|
|
||||
Dr Graham Jones | Trustee | 03 August 2017 |
|
|
||||
JOHN EDWARD TALLIS | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
ROBERT HODGES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JANET Margery PIERCE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS VIKKI AVERY | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | 30/09/2022 | 30/09/2023 | 30/09/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £24.08k | £22.88k | £16.74k | £12.07k | £14.09k | |
|
Total expenditure | £18.85k | £16.73k | £16.05k | £11.09k | £15.03k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £60 | £178 | N/A | £83 | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £12.37k | £19.20k | £4.36k | £1.03k | £2.41k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2024 | 15 April 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | 01 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | 28 November 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 04 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 02 December 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
SCHEME SEALED 16 DECEMBER 1999
Charitable objects
TO FURTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE GENERAL BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA COMPRISING THE PARISHES OF TARRINGTON DORMINGTON AND STOKE EDITH
Area of benefit
PARISHES OF TARRINGTON DORMINGTON AND STOKE EDITH.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Orchard Hill
Tarrington
Hereford
HR1 4EU
- Phone:
- 01432890720
- Email:
- ladyemilyhall@gmail.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window