THE BRILL SOCIETY

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Arranges talks and visits on environmental and historical matters, arranges the opening to the public of a historic windmill, plants trees, recognises significant contributions to local amenities and activities.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
30 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Buckinghamshire
Governance
- 26 February 2001: Standard registration
No other names
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Andy Fisher | Chair | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Margaret Robins | Trustee | 18 December 2024 |
|
|
||||
James Field | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Marie Pohler | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
||||
Anthony John Harris | Trustee | 06 December 2022 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £2.39k | £7.17k | £1.46k | £24.95k | £10.97k | |
|
Total expenditure | £19.82k | £1.09k | £2.04k | £28.20k | £957 | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | £4.00k | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 16 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 29 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 08 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 08 September 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 18 March 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED ON 16 MARCH, 2000 AND AMENDED ON 6 FEBRUARY, 2001.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT FOR THE FOLLOWING PURPOSES IN THE AREA COMPRISING THE PARISH OF BRILL IN THE COUNTY OF BUCKINGHAM SHIRE (HEREINAFTER REFERRED TO AS THE AREA OF BENEFIT):- 1.TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC PARTICULARLY IN THE GEOGRAPHY, HISTORY, NATURAL HISTORY AND ARCHITECTURE OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 2.TO SECURE THE PRESERVATION, CONSERVATION, PROTECTION, DEVELOPMENT AND IMPROVEMENT OF FEATURES OF HISTORIC OR PUBLIC INTEREST IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 3.TO PROMOTE HIGH STANDARDS OF PLANNING AND ARCHITECTURE IN OR AFFECTING THE AREA OF BENEFIT; 4.TO OR FOR SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF THE AREA OF BENEFIT AS THE CHARITY THROUGH ITS EXECUTIVE COMMITTEE MAY FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
BRILL, BUCKINGHAMSHIRE.
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Old Library
19 Church Street
Brill
Aylesbury
BUCKS
HP18 9RT
- Phone:
- 07881950684
- Email:
- andy@theit4u.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window