LAZARUS HEALING TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Providing teaching and discipleship on a variety of Christian topics and distributing a range of support materials such as DVDs, manuals and books.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
28 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Religious Activities
- The General Public/mankind
- Other Charitable Activities
- Switzerland
Governance
- 14 August 2000: Standard registration
- LAZARUS (Working name)
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Elizabeth Carlson | Trustee | 08 September 2015 |
|
|
||||
REV BLAIR TRUETT CARLSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
OLAVE MARY CRAUFORD SNELLING | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £23.08k | £18.03k | £24.06k | £25.65k | £26.68k | |
|
Total expenditure | £24.91k | £11.14k | £20.19k | £36.84k | £27.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | 11 September 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 12 December 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 23 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 07 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 25 August 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH ACROSS THE DENOMINATIONS OF THE CHRISTIAN CHURCH BY FURTHERING THE HEALING MINISTRY OF JESUS CHRIST.
Charitable objects
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 17 APRIL 2000 AS AMENDED BY SUPPLEMENTAL DEED DATED 14 JULY 2000.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Contact information
- Address:
-
12 Reedmace Road
BICESTER
OX26 3WW
- Phone:
- 00000000000
- Email:
- ROSEMARY@LAZARUSTRUST.COM
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window