EDUCARE FOUNDATION (WOLVERHAMPTON)

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
with Educare Foundation have offered help and support to different organizations by using Health care professionals to give Presentations on, Ovarian Cancer and Breast Cancer. The organization engaged in a Multi Media Project with the local community. was involved in a community project for Black History Month. Educare has promoted social care alongside health awareness in the community.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £10,239 from 10239 government grant(s)
People

12 Trustee(s)
6 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Economic/community Development/employment
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Birmingham City
- Coventry City
- Dudley
- Sandwell
- Solihull
- Walsall
- Wolverhampton
Governance
- 28 February 2001: Standard registration
- EDUCARE (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
12 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
THESSIA GORDON | Chair |
|
|
|||||
Shirley Hemans | Trustee | 08 November 2022 |
|
|
||||
IRENE BRUMLEY | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|||||
MARGARET ROSE DOCKERY | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
SONIA STEPHENSON | Trustee | 12 November 2019 |
|
|
||||
MARJORIE FANNELL | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
Marjorie Fannell | Trustee | 10 October 2017 |
|
|
||||
HUGO ROBINSON | Trustee | 02 September 2011 |
|
|
||||
Geneva Carney | Trustee | 22 November 2001 |
|
|
||||
DALSIE ROBINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MILLICENT EVADNE GREY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
FAY THOMPSON | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £1.13k | £75 | £1.00k | £7.00k | £12.72k | |
|
Total expenditure | £640 | £258 | £1.60k | £4.00k | £3.08k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | £10.24k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 12 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 09 February 2022 | 9 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 29 April 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 10 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 30 JANUARY 2001 as amended on 08 Sept 2024
Charitable objects
TO PRESERVE AND PROTECT THE GOOD HEALTH OF THE PUBLIC AND IN PARTICULAR THOSE OF AFRICAN-CARIBBEAN DESCENT WITHIN THE CITY OF WOLVERHAMPTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS BY A) THE PROVISION OF TRAINING INFORMATION AND SUPPORT B) RAISING AWARENESS IN ALL MATTERS RELATING TO THE HEALTH NEEDS OF AFRICAN CARIBBEAN PEOPLE
Area of benefit
WOLVERHAMTON AND SURROUNDING AREAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE MOUNT BETHEL A M E ZION CHURCH
1 ST. GEORGES PARADE
WOLVERHAMPTON
WV2 1AZ
- Phone:
- 01902711008
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window