THE METHADONE ALLIANCE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Alliance is a user led organisation which provides advocacy, training and helpline services to those currently in drug treatment, those who have accessed drug treatment in the past and those who may access drug treatment in the future.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 13 July 2000: Standard registration
- 02 October 2014: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- THE ALLIANCE (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £190.09k | £337.68k | £310.14k | £447.07k | £299.37k | |
|
Total expenditure | £232.31k | £308.65k | £330.36k | £416.03k | £301.46k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 29 May 2012 | 119 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 29 May 2012 | 119 days late |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 28 FEBRUARY 2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 24 JUNE 2000.
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE SICKNESS FOR THOSE PERSONS SUFFERING FROM DRUG DEPENDENCY, IN PARTICULAR THROUGH THE PROVISION OF INFORMATION, ADVICE AND SUPPORT.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window