THE NEW FRIENDS OF ALL SAINTS CASTLE CAMPS

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
We organise fund raising activities to raise money for the restoration, repair and improvement of the church of All Saints Castle Camps. With events like Open Gardens, Plant Sales, Barbeques and Quiz's etc. We also run a Draw Club.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Cambridgeshire
Governance
- 16 September 2000: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Lindi Kent | Chair | 04 July 2018 |
|
|
||||||
Rev Ian StJohn Fisher | Trustee | 04 July 2018 |
|
|||||||
PATRICIA FLORENCE SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | 31/12/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £3.90k | £4.73k | £4.81k | £4.39k | £3.91k | |
|
Total expenditure | £1.86k | £2.44k | £2.59k | £27.66k | £1.52k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2024 | 06 February 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 24 April 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 18 May 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 24 March 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 26 August 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 26/08/00 as amended on 29 Aug 2021
Charitable objects
TO MAINTAIN, REPAIR, RESTORE, PRESERVE, IMPROVE, BEAUTIFY AND RECONSTRUCT FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE PUBLIC THE FABRIC OF THE CHURCH OF ALL SAINTS ITS MONUMENTS, FIXTURES, FITTINGS, FURNITURE, STAINED GLASS, ORNAMENTS AND OTHER CHATTELS AND ITS CHURCHYARD
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED, IN PRACTICE CASTLE CAMPS, SOUTH CAMBS
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE CAMPS VICARAGE
PARK LANE
CASTLE CAMPS
CAMBRIDGE
CB21 4SR
- Phone:
- 01799585977
- Email:
- ian59Fisher@btinternet.com
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window