Financial history RELATE YORK AND HARROGATE

Charity Number: 1081251
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2008 31/03/2009 31/03/2010 31/03/2011 31/03/2012
Total gross income £320.33k £327.71k £314.73k £352.45k £378.28k
Total expenditure £333.14k £311.40k £305.65k £328.47k £361.40k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A