RELATE YORK AND HARROGATE
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The provision of:- relationship counselling for individuals and couples:counselling for Young People aged 10 years upwards: Family Counselling: Psychosexual Therapy: Life Skills programmes
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2012
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- North Yorkshire
Governance
- 26 June 2000: Standard registration
- 09 January 2014: Removed (Transfer of funds)
- 09 January 2014: Funds transferred to 1144516 RELATE MID-YORKSHIRE
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £320.33k | £327.71k | £314.73k | £352.45k | £378.28k | |
|
Total expenditure | £333.14k | £311.40k | £305.65k | £328.47k | £361.40k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 04 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 17 October 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 06 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 06 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 27 January 2011 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 13 January 2011 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 20 APRIL 2000 AND AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTIONS DATED 24 NOVEMBER 2004, 17 OCTOBER 2006 AND 31 OCTOBER 2007 AND 30 SEPTEMBER
Charitable objects
4.(A) THE OBJECTS OF THE CENTRE ARE; 4.1 TO EDUCATE THE PUBLIC CONCERNING THE BENEFITS OF SECURE COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE AND FAMILY LIFE IN ORDER TO IMPROVE THE EMOTIONAL, SEXUAL AND SPIRITUAL WELL-BEING OF INDIVIDUALS WHICH IS DERIVED FROM COMMITTED RELATIONSHIPS; 4.2 TO SEEK TO ENHANCE, THE GOOD HEALTH, BOTH MENTAL AND PHYSICAL, OF ADULTS AND CHILDREN BY: 4.2.1 INCREASING PUBLIC AWARENESS OF THE BENEFIT OF COMMITTED COUPLE RELATIONSHIPS, MARRIAGE, AND FAMILY LIFE; AND 4.2.2 WORKING TO PREVENT POVERTY, HARDSHIP AND DISTRESS CAUSED BY THE BREAKDOWN OF SUCH RELATIONSHIPS; 4.3 TO PROVIDE COUNSELLING, ADVICE, EDUCATION, GUIDANCE AND RELIEF TO ADULTS AND/OR CHILDREN IN RELATION TO ANY ASPECT OF CONTEMPORARY LIFE OR WORK WHICH; 4.3.1 MAY PREJUDICE THEIR PHYSICAL OR MENTAL WELL BEING; OR - 4.3.2 INFLUENCE, EITHER DIRECTLY OR INDIRECTLY, THEIR PRESENT OR FUTURE FAMILY OR COUPLE RELATIONSHIP; 4.4 TO RELIEVE THOSE IN NEED BY REASON OF YOUTH, AGE, ILL-HEALTH, DISABILITY, FINANCIAL HARDSHIP OR OTHER DISADVANTAGE; AND 4.5 TO PROMOTE RESEARCH INTO ALL OF THE ABOVE OBJECTS AND TO MAKE THE RESULTS AVAILABLE TO THE PUBLIC.
Area of benefit
NORTH YORKSHIRE
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window