FRIENDS OF COTHERSTONE PRIMARY SCHOOL

Charity number: 1080657
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

The Friends of Cotherstone School raises money for use by Cotherstone Primary School, facilitates a good relationship between the school and the local community and supports the school in any way deemed helpful.

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 July 2023

Total income: £5,412
Total expenditure: £4,232

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

No information available

Trustee payments

No information available

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • Education/training
Who the charity helps:
  • Children/young People
How the charity helps:
  • Makes Grants To Organisations
  • Provides Human Resources
Where the charity operates:
  • Durham

Governance

Registration history:
  • 10 May 2000: Standard registration
Organisation type:
Other
Other names:

No other names

Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
No information available
Policies:
  • Complaints handling
  • Conflicting interests
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity does not own and/or lease land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

6 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Kelly-Marie Green Chair 12 November 2018
COTHERSTONE PRE-SCHOOL PLAYGROUP
Received: On time
Evangeline Louise Lynda Bark Trustee 18 April 2024
None on record
Joanne Elizabeth Hobson Trustee 18 April 2024
None on record
Rachel Emma Atkinson Trustee 12 November 2021
None on record
Victoria Emma-Jane Hindle Trustee 12 November 2021
None on record
Claire Rowena Elliot Carr Trustee 13 May 2021
None on record

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/07/2019 31/07/2020 31/07/2021 31/07/2022 31/07/2023
Total gross income £3.73k £2.26k £726 £6.57k £5.41k
Total expenditure £2.81k £1.97k £1.83k £5.97k £4.23k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 July 2023 01 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2023 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2022 12 February 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2022 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2021 21 December 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2021 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2020 26 April 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2020 Not Required
Annual return 31 July 2019 10 January 2021 224 days late
Accounts and TAR 31 July 2019 Not Required
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
COTHERSTONE PRIMARY SCHOOL
COTHERSTONE
BARNARD CASTLE
DL12 9QB
Phone:
01388213397
Email:
No information available
Website:

No information available