THE MATRIX TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Matrix exists to catalyse change for vulnerable young people by connecting them to their community so they are nurtured, inspired, celebrated and empowered. Following the Christian ethos we work in partnership with young people, schools, churches, organisations and the community to help all young people make the most of their lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 August 2023
Total income includes £15,576 from 2 government grant(s)
People

7 Trustee(s)
21 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Surrey
Governance
- 04 August 2000: Standard registration
No other names
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
7 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Simon David Slater | Chair | 04 December 2014 |
|
|
||||
Victoria Jennifer Gomes | Trustee | 06 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Jennifer Margaret Hall | Trustee | 17 March 2022 |
|
|
||||
Lindsay Sarah Jespersen | Trustee | 16 December 2020 |
|
|
||||
Kenneth Mead | Trustee | 30 September 2020 |
|
|
||||
Neil Robert Fenton | Trustee | 05 March 2020 |
|
|||||
Matt Davis | Trustee | 06 September 2018 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/08/2019 | 31/08/2020 | 31/08/2021 | 31/08/2022 | 31/08/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £157.46k | £242.43k | £334.18k | £429.82k | £499.63k | |
|
Total expenditure | £153.65k | £151.86k | £252.13k | £398.72k | £522.91k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | £60.35k | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £8.24k | £1.43k | £576 | £15.58k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2023 | 17 June 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2022 | 20 June 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2022 | 22 May 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2021 | 30 May 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2021 | 25 May 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2020 | 25 May 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2020 | 10 June 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 August 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 August 2019 | 26 May 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEM & ARTS 6.4.00 as amended on 25 Jan 2019
Charitable objects
(A) TO ACT AS A RESOURCE FOR YOUNG PEOPLE, UP TO THE AGE OF 25, LIVING IN SURREY AND SURROUNDING AREAS, BY PROVIDING ADVICE AND ASSISTANCE, AND ORGANISING PROGRAMMES OF PHYSICAL, EDUCATIONAL AND OTHER ACTIVITIES AS A MEANS OF: (I) ADVANCING IN LIFE AND HELPING YOUNG PEOPLE BY DEVELOPING THEIR SKILLS, CAPACITIES AND CAPABILITIES TO ENABLE THEM TO PARTICIPATE IN SOCIETY AS INDEPENDENT, MATURE AND RESPONSIBLE INDIVIDUALS; (II) ADVANCING EDUCATION; (III) RELIEVING UNEMPLOYMENT; (IV) PROVIDING RECREATIONAL AND LEISURE TIME ACTIVITY IN THE INTERESTS OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR PEOPLE LIVING IN THE AREA OF BENEFIT WHO HAVE NEED BY REASON OF THEIR YOUTH, AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABILITY, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH A VIEW TO IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF SUCH PERSONS. B) TO RELIEVE PERSONS WHO ARE IN CONDITIONS OF NEED OR HARDSHIP AND TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS CAUSED THEREBY C) TO ADVANCE EDUCATION BY SUCH MEANS AS THE TRUSTEES MAY CONSIDER APPROPRIATE INCLUDING BY MEANS OF ESTABLISHING AND OPERATING ANY EDUCATIONAL ESTABLISHMENT OR ESTABLISHMENTS D) TO PROVIDE FACILITIES FOR RECREATION OR OTHER LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR YOUNG PERSONS WHO HAVE NEED OF SUCH FACILITIES BY REASON OF THEIR AGE, INFIRMITY OR DISABLEMENT, POVERTY OR SOCIAL AND ECONOMIC CIRCUMSTANCES WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR SUCH PERSONS E) TO ADVANCE THE CHRISTIAN FAITH IN ACCORDANCE WITH THE STATEMENT OF BELIEFS APPEARING IN THE SCHEDULE HERETO ATTACHED F) TO PROMOTE AND FULFIL SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES BENEFICIAL TO THE COMMUNITY IN SUCH PARTS OF THE UNITED KINGDOM OR THE WORLD AS THE TRUSTEES MAY FROM TIME TO TIME THINK FIT
Area of benefit
SURREY
Contact information
- Address:
-
Allen House Pavilion
Eastgate Gardens
GUILDFORD
GU1 4AZ
- Phone:
- 01483574900
- Email:
- info@matrixtrust.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window