ZEDEK

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Make grant to needy.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 05 April 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 20 October 2000: Standard registration
- TZEDEK (Previous name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
MICHAEL WEISSBRAUN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
DEBBIE WEISSBRAUN | Trustee |
|
||||||||
SYED KAMAL PASHA | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 05/04/2020 | 05/04/2021 | 05/04/2022 | 05/04/2023 | 05/04/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £62.84k | £77.95k | £75.05k | £35.18k | £17.32k | |
|
Total expenditure | £55.85k | £77.61k | £72.67k | £55.87k | £21.35k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 05 April 2024 | 04 December 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2024 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 05 April 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2023 | 09 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2022 | 27 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2021 | 21 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 05 April 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 05 April 2020 | 21 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED MADE ON 24 APRIL 2000
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS (THE "OBJECTS") IN THE UNITED KINGDOM AND OVERSEAS ("THE AREA OF BENEFIT"): FOR THE RELIEF OF POVERTY AND SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES MAY DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NATIONAL AND OVERSEAS
Contact information
- Address:
-
80 PRINCES PARK AVENUE
LONDON
NW11 0JX
- Phone:
- 02082099880
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window