Financial history THE MARY LADY FULLER CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity number: 1084954
Charity reporting is overdue by 71 days
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/04/2020 30/04/2021 30/04/2022 30/04/2023 30/04/2024
Total gross income £21.39k £19.67k £14.22k £15.50k £108.59k
Total expenditure £21.09k £21.51k £21.00k £6.16k £6.70k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A