VISION 21 (GLOUCESTERSHIRE) LTD

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Our mission is to make Gloucestershire's communities sustainable and more resilient. We are as much a social organisation as we are an environmental one and by helping people, groups and organisations to enhance their environs and life opportunities, we help everyone to move towards a Net Zero Carbon position.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income includes £79,878 from 2 government contract(s) and £19,800 from 4 government grant(s)
People

6 Trustee(s)
150 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Recreation
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Gloucestershire
Governance
- 23 November 2000: Standard registration
- CHELTENHAM CCC (Working name)
- CHELTENHAM CENTRE FOR CHANGE (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investing charity funds policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Rowena Louise Kay | Trustee | 24 January 2018 |
|
|||||
Brian Sloan | Trustee | 16 March 2017 |
|
|
||||
Peter Brian Clegg | Trustee | 04 January 2017 |
|
|
||||
MARTIN ROY HEWETT | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
GIDEON CAPIE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
RODNEY SMITH | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £178.43k | £177.96k | £238.48k | £220.02k | £288.81k | |
|
Total expenditure | £144.40k | £133.41k | £204.38k | £298.23k | £290.84k | |
|
Income from government contracts | £46.10k | £52.84k | £70.68k | £90.13k | £79.88k | |
|
Income from government grants | £2.50k | £69.43k | £21.33k | £8.00k | £19.80k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 26 November 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 22 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 17 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 15 May 2024 | 105 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 12 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 26 January 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 27 January 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 15 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 08 February 2021 | 8 days late | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 8 FEBRUARY 1999 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION DATED 7 OCTOBER 2000 AND 30 APRIL 2008
Charitable objects
TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION AND TRAINING OF THE LOCAL COMMUNITY IN THOSE ASPECTS OF SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT WHICH CAN IMPROVE THEIR QUALITY OF LIFE AND LOCAL ENVIRONMENT, AND TO PROMOTE RESEARCH AND THE DISSEMINATION OF INFORMATION, FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, ABOUT SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT. "SUSTAINABLE DEVELOPMENT" MEANS DEVELOPMENT CARRIED OUT WITH AWARENESS OF THE ECOLOGICAL AND/OR SOCIO-ECONOMIC IMPACTS OF BUILDING MATERIALS, ENERGY SYSTEMS, WASTE SYSTEMS, FOOD, TRANSPORT, WASTE, BIODIVERSITY AND LIFESTYLES, AND WITH A VIEW TO CONSERVING THE EARTH'S NATURAL RESOURCES.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
The Workshop
Malthouse Lane
CHELTENHAM
Gloucestershire
GL50 4EY
- Phone:
- 01242224321
- Email:
- office@vision21.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window