RESPECT
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Respect is the UK membership association for domestic violence perpetrator programmes and associated support services. Our vision is to end violence and abuse in intimate partner and close family relationships. Our key focus is on increasing the safety and well-being of victims by promoting, supporting, delivering and developing effective interventions with perpetrators.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2011
Total income:
£816,884
Donations and legacies | £143.52k | |
Charitable activities | £673.30k | |
Other trading activities | £0 | |
Investments | £0 | |
Other | £62 |
Total expenditure:
£760,498
Raising funds | £0 | |
Charitable activities | £742.10k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £18.40k | |
Charitable expenditure | £742.10k | |
Retained for future use | £56.39k |
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Human Rights/religious Or Racial Harmony/equality Or Diversity
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Sponsors Or Undertakes Research
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Throughout England And Wales
- Northern Ireland
- Scotland
Governance
- 04 December 2000: Standard registration
- 29 November 2012: Removed (Funds transferred (incor))
- 29 November 2012: Funds transferred to 1141636 RESPECT
No other names
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £388.57k | £506.99k | £814.58k | £877.89k | £816.88k | |
|
Total expenditure | £335.85k | £463.55k | £754.92k | £929.97k | £760.50k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £165.38k | £241.22k | £230.30k | £143.52k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £336.08k | £569.83k | £647.55k | £673.30k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £5.54k | £3.53k | £30 | £0 | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £62 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £443.86k | £726.53k | £907.84k | £742.10k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £12.90k | £19.67k | £17.29k | £14.06k | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2007 | 31/03/2008 | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £3.23k | £4.37k | £1.32k | £2.18k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £268.02k | £331.76k | £257.40k | £312.20k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £126.51k | £131.72k | £106.40k | £105.67k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2011 | 23 January 2012 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2011 | 23 January 2012 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2010 | 20 December 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2010 | 25 November 2010 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2009 | 20 January 2010 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2009 | 20 January 2010 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
CONSTITUTION ADOPTED 04/02/2000 AS AMENDED ON 08/11/2000 AS AMENDED ON 25/05/2004 AS AMENDED ON 15/11/2007 AS AMENDED ON 17/02/2011
Charitable objects
TO RELIEVE THE DISTRESS AND SUFFERING CAUSED BY DOMESTIC VIOLENCE AND ABUSE, IN PARTICULAR BUT NOT EXCLUSIVELY BY EDUCATING PEOPLE WHO WORK WITH, OR WHO ARE OTHERWISE INVOLVED WITH, THE PERPETRATORS OF AND THOSE SUFFERING FROM DOMESTIC VIOLENCE (PRACTITIONERS) WITH A VIEW TO INCREASING THE PHYSICAL SAFETY AND MENTAL WELL-BEING OF PEOPLE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED SUCH VIOLENCE OR ABUSE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window