THE DENGIE PROJECT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Provision of a range of services to empower older people of the Dengie Peninsula to make choices, which enable them to reach optimum levels of health and fitness and to lead rich, safe and fulfilling lives.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

6 Trustee(s)
4 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Essex
Governance
- Knightswood Care (Working name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Campaigns and political activity policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Engaging external speakers at charity events policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Fiona Jocelyn Scott Mitchell | Chair | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Scott James Parsons | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Stuart Pinch | Trustee | 01 December 2023 |
|
|
||||
Professor Janet Mary Band | Trustee | 12 October 2022 |
|
|
||||
Kathleen Norma Carnell | Trustee | 25 November 2020 |
|
|
||||
CHRISTINA FISHER | Trustee | 31 March 2015 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £233.05k | £211.15k | £238.50k | £389.34k | £472.51k | |
|
Total expenditure | £237.09k | £161.18k | £290.37k | £357.80k | £458.89k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £87.65k | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 23 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR |
31 March 2024
(These accounts |
23 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 31 January 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 31 January 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 31 December 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 31 January 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED 25 JUNE 1998 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION ON 6 FEBRUARY 2007.
Charitable objects
TO PROMOTE, SUPPORT AND ADVANCE SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTION OR INSTITUTIONS OR CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE CHARITY THINKS FIT FOR THE BENEFIT OF INDIVIDUALS PARTICULARLY IN THE AREA OF MALDON (ESSEX) DISTRICT COUNCIL OR SUCH OTHER AREAS AS THE TRUSTEES OF THE CHARITY SHALL DETERMINE.
Area of benefit
THE AREA OF MALDON (ESSEX) DISTRICT COUNCIL OR OTHER AREAS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
Knightswood Day Care Centre
Asheldham Hall Farm
Hall Road
Asheldham
SOUTHMINSTER
CM0 7JF
- Phone:
- 01621774532
- Email:
- finance@dengiept.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window