AGE UK CROYDON

Charity number: 1081013
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)

Charity overview

Activities - how the charity spends its money

Assisting older people to maintain their independence and live full and active lives

Income and expenditure

Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024

Charitable expenditure

Charitable expenditure

Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.

In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.

Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.

By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.

Fundraising

No information available

Trading

One or more trustees are also directors of the subsidiaries

Trustee payments

No trustees receive any remuneration, payments or benefits from the charity.

What, who, how, where

What the charity does:
  • General Charitable Purposes
Who the charity helps:
  • Elderly/old People
  • People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
  • Other Charities Or Voluntary Bodies
  • The General Public/mankind
How the charity helps:
  • Provides Advocacy/advice/information
Where the charity operates:
  • Croydon

Governance

Registration history:
  • 02 June 2000: Standard registration
  • 29 November 2012: Funds received from 216590 THORNTON HEATH DARBY AND JOAN CLUB LIMITED
Organisation type:
Charitable company
Other names:
  • AGE CONCERN CROYDON (Previous name)
Company number:
Gift aid:
Recognised by HMRC for gift aid
Other regulators:
  • Financial Conduct Authority
Policies:
  • Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
  • Complaints handling
  • Complaints policy and procedures
  • Conflicting interests
  • Financial reserves policy and procedures
  • Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
  • Internal risk management policy and procedures
  • Investing charity funds policy and procedures
  • Investment
  • Paying staff
  • Risk management
  • Safeguarding policy and procedures
  • Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
  • Serious incident reporting policy and procedures
  • Social media policy and procedures
  • Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
  • Trustee expenses policy and procedures
  • Volunteer management
Land and property:
This charity owns and/or leases land or property

Trustees

Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service

8 Trustee(s)

Name Role Date of appointment Other trusteeships Reporting status of other trusteeships
Charlotte Elgar Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
Michael Haahr Trustee 24 September 2024
None on record
Kofi Kyei Trustee 05 March 2024
None on record
Christopher John Briggs Trustee 08 March 2023
None on record
Imran Mannan Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Dee Davison Trustee 06 September 2022
None on record
Opama Khan Trustee 17 November 2020
None on record
Oumaduth Sauba Trustee 14 November 2017
WHITEHORSE YOUTH CENTRE
Received: On time
The Croydon 60+ Benevolent Fund Limited
Received: On time
WHITEHORSE YOUTH CENTRE
Received: 68 days late

Financial history

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £1.82m £1.75m £1.93m £2.03m £2.31m
Total expenditure £1.83m £1.74m £1.74m £2.06m £2.31m
Income from government contracts £533.01k £523.41k £1.46m £1.72m £1.48m
Income from government grants N/A N/A £40.00k £52.04k £63.95k
Income - Donations and legacies £149.70k £21.61k £113.54k £110.27k £161.81k
Income - Other trading activities £163.81k £44.51k £5.43k £6.93k £4.74k
Income - Charitable activities £1.51m £1.68m £1.81m £1.92m £2.11m
Income - Endowments £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Investment £69 £0 £7 £0 £39.10k
Income - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Income - Legacies £62.31k £2.20k £13.00k £17.52k £2.18k
Expenditure - Charitable activities £1.83m £1.73m £1.74m £2.03m £2.27m
Expenditure - Raising funds £216 £7.42k £0 £32.76k £34.07k
Expenditure - Governance £28.17k £44.97k £7.77k £9.45k £7.86k
Expenditure - Grants institution £0 £44.97k £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Investment management £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Expenditure - Other £0 £0 £0 £0 £0

Assets and liabilities

Definitions for assets and liabilities
Own use assets

These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.

Long term Investments

Investments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.

Other assets

These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.

Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability

This is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.

Total liabilities

These are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.

" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.
Asset / Liability 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Own use assets £516.18k £536.09k £528.72k £527.33k £519.63k
Long-term investments £100.16k £112.11k £116.82k £113.38k £120.01k
Other assets £506.14k £632.64k £1.76m £1.93m £1.50m
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability £0 £0 £0 £0 £0
Total liabilities £105.12k £237.67k £1.18m £1.36m £926.41k

Accounts and annual returns

This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 31 March 2024 10 October 2024 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2024 10 October 2024 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2023 07 December 2023 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2022 13 October 2022 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2022 13 October 2022 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2021 14 October 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Annual return 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time
Accounts and TAR 31 March 2020 12 January 2021 On Time Download Open in new window
Submit annual return Open in new window

Contact information

Address:
81 BRIGSTOCK ROAD
THORNTON HEATH
SURREY
CR7 7JH
Phone:
02086837100