Accounts and annual returns SECURING PROPERTY ECONOMICALLY EFFECTIVELY DAILY

Charity Number: 1081283
Removed charity
This table shows the charity's record of submitting annual returns, accounts and trustees' annual report (TAR) for the last five financial periods.
Title Reporting year Date received Received Download
Annual return 28 February 2009 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2009 Not submitted
Annual return 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Accounts and TAR 29 February 2008 Not submitted
Annual return 28 February 2007 21 December 2007 On Time
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2007 28 December 2007 On Time
Annual return 28 February 2006 21 December 2007 358 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2006 28 December 2007 365 days late
Annual return 28 February 2005 28 December 2007 730 days late
Accounts and TAR 28 February 2005 30 November 2007 702 days late