GONE FOREVER BEREAVEMENT TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The Gone Forever Bereavement Trust seeks to promote an understanding of the issues which surround loss and bereavement within the child's, or young person's, environment. It does this by providing training, conferences, seminars and publications as well as providing individual advice to parents/guardians/professionals who are seeking to help grieving children and/or young people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 30 September 2021
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- Education/training
- Other Charitable Purposes
- Children/young People
- Other Defined Groups
- The General Public/mankind
- Provides Human Resources
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Throughout England And Wales
Governance
- 17 May 2000: Standard registration
- THE GONE FOREVER PROJECT (Working name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
ELAINE HUTCHINSON | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MRS JILL MOORE | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
SHIRLEY MAY PAYNE | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 30/09/2017 | 30/09/2018 | 30/09/2019 | 30/09/2020 | 30/09/2021 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £0 | £1.78k | £1.43k | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total expenditure | £527 | £78 | £350 | £272 | £272 | |
|
Income from government contracts | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £0 | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2023 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 280 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 646 days | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2022 | Overdue | Charity reporting is overdue by 646 days | |
Annual return | 30 September 2021 | 28 June 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2020 | 28 June 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 30 September 2019 | 22 July 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 30 September 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 12 JANUARY 2000
Charitable objects
THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND UPON TRUST TO APPLY THE INCOME AND IF THOUGHT FIT THE CAPITAL THEREOF FOR THE FOLLOWING CHARITABLE PURPOSES: TO ADVANCE THE EDUCATION OF THE GENERAL PUBLIC WITHOUT REGARDS TO AGE, DISABILITY, RACE, RELIGIOUS OR POLITICAL OPINION, SEX OR SEXUAL ORIENTATION ABOUT LOSS AND BEREAVEMENT AND TO PROMOTE AWARENESS AND UNDERSTANDING OF THE WAYS IN WHICH LOSS AND BEREAVEMENT PARTICULARLY AFFECTS YOUNG PEOPLE. TO RELIEVE THE SUFFERING AND HARDSHIP OF YOUNG PEOPLE WHO HAVE EXPERIENCED LOSS AND BEREAVEMENT AND TO WORK WITH INDIVIDUALS, STATUTORY AND OTHER VOLUNTARY ORGANISATIONS TO HELP IMPROVE THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE OF THE SAID YOUNG PEOPLE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
89 STANDON CRESCENT
SHEFFIELD
S9 1PN
- Phone:
- 01142438773
- Email:
- shirley.payne@waitrose.com
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window