Financial history WESTERFIELD VILLAGE HALL

Charity number: 1086331
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/12/2019 31/12/2020 31/12/2021 31/12/2022 31/12/2023
Total gross income £9.84k £13.73k £20.57k £12.26k £16.10k
Total expenditure £4.84k £3.77k £8.20k £23.57k £4.89k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A £10.03k £18.71k £2.67k N/A