EASTSIDE COMMUNITY TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Working with residents and service providers to deliver neighbourhood management in Easton and Lawrence Hill in Bristol to improve the lives of local people.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
Total income:
£1,019,964
Donations and legacies | £57.77k | |
Charitable activities | £939.16k | |
Other trading activities | £9.15k | |
Investments | £13.88k | |
Other | £0 |
Total expenditure:
£919,643
Raising funds | £34.49k | |
Charitable activities | £885.15k | |
Other | £0 |
£0 investments gains (losses)
Total income includes £491,864 from 11 government grant(s)
Charitable expenditure
Charitable expenditure with investment gains
Charitable expenditure
Some charities generate all, or a substantial part, of their income from investments which may have been donated to the charity as endowment or set aside by the charity from its own resources in the past. Such investments usually take the form of stocks and shares but may include other assets, such as property, that are capable of generating income and/or capital growth.
In managing their spending and investments charities need to strike a balance between the needs of future and current beneficiaries. They also need to take account of spending commitments that may stretch over a number of future years. To do this, charities will normally adopt an investment strategy designed to generate both income and capital growth. To maximise returns trustees may commit to investment strategies for several years.
Investments can experience large swings in value so trustees may, in a particular year, decide to realise and spend part of their charity’s capital or to invest part of its income.
By clicking the investment gains checkbox the charitable spending bar is adjusted to take account of capital growth as well as income. This shows the balance the charity is striking, between spending on current beneficiaries and retaining resources for future beneficiaries.
Raising funds and other expenditure | £34.49k | |
Charitable expenditure | £885.15k | |
Retained for future use | £100.32k |
People

30 Employee(s)
9 Trustee(s)
5 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Accommodation/housing
- Environment/conservation/heritage
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Other Defined Groups
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Provides Advocacy/advice/information
- Acts As An Umbrella Or Resource Body
- Bristol City
Governance
- COMMUNITY AT HEART (Previous name)
- EASTON AND LAWRENCE HILL NEIGHBOURHOOD MANAGEMENT (Previous name)
- Bullying and harassment policy and procedures
- Complaints handling
- Complaints policy and procedures
- Conflicting interests
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Internal risk management policy and procedures
- Investment
- Paying staff
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
- Social media policy and procedures
- Trustee conflicts of interest policy and procedures
- Trustee expenses policy and procedures
- Volunteer management
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
9 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Emmanuel Maunganidze | Chair | 03 September 2020 |
|
|||||
Adebimpe Janet Ayeni | Trustee | 25 October 2024 |
|
|
||||
Jon Edward Fox | Trustee | 07 September 2023 |
|
|
||||
Muna Ali Mohamed Mohamed | Trustee | 31 March 2023 |
|
|
||||
Edward Frank Fowler | Trustee | 10 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Azmina Mitha Faisal Ms | Trustee | 02 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rosanna Clare Dearbergh Wakefield | Trustee | 23 June 2022 |
|
|
||||
Zoe Sheriff | Trustee | 06 May 2020 |
|
|||||
NOELLE RUMBALL | Trustee | 14 September 2016 |
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £289.53k | £1.12m | £751.01k | £964.72k | £1.02m | |
|
Total expenditure | £290.70k | £625.72k | £699.83k | £822.95k | £919.64k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | £117.62k | £239.82k | £213.74k | £168.91k | £491.86k | |
|
Income - Donations and legacies | N/A | £372.51k | £96.43k | £72.83k | £57.77k | |
|
Income - Other trading activities | N/A | £8.83k | £10.18k | £13.43k | £9.15k | |
|
Income - Charitable activities | N/A | £729.96k | £643.37k | £876.07k | £939.16k | |
|
Income - Endowments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Investment | N/A | £3.81k | £1.04k | £2.38k | £13.88k | |
|
Income - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Income - Legacies | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Charitable activities | N/A | £493.27k | £554.83k | £680.02k | £885.15k | |
|
Expenditure - Raising funds | N/A | £132.46k | £145.00k | £142.93k | £34.49k | |
|
Expenditure - Governance | N/A | £3.95k | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Grants institution | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Investment management | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Expenditure - Other | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 |
Assets and liabilities
Definitions for assets and liabilities
These are assets, other than investments, which are held for more than 12 months and used to run and administer the charity such as buildings, offices, exhibits and fixtures and fittings.
Long term InvestmentsInvestments are assets held by the charity with the sole aim of generating income which will be used for their charitable purposes such as deposit accounts, shares, rental property and unit trusts.
Investment assets are re-valued every year and included in the balance sheet at their current market value.
Long term investments are held for more than 12 months.
These are assets held generally for less than 12 months such as cash and bank balances, debtors, investments to be sold within the coming year and trading stock.
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liabilityThis is a surplus or deficit in any defined benefit pension scheme operated and represents a potential long-term asset or liability.
Total liabilitiesThese are all the amounts owed by the charity at the balance sheet date to third parties such as bills due but not yet paid, bank overdrafts and loans and mortgages.
Asset / Liability | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Own use assets | N/A | £589.37k | £588.38k | £585.49k | £589.58k | |
|
Long-term investments | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Other assets | N/A | £537.35k | £541.18k | £668.96k | £714.69k | |
|
Defined benefit pension scheme asset or liability | N/A | £0 | £0 | £0 | £0 | |
|
Total liabilities | N/A | £171.82k | £123.46k | £106.59k | £56.08k |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 18 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 10 November 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 23 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 15 November 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 20 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES INCORPORATED 28/06/2000 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 12/09/2007 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 13/03/2008 AS AMENDED BY CERTIFICATE OF INCORPORATION ON CHANGE OF NAME DATED 07/04/2011 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 04/10/2013 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 20 JUL 2015 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION(S) DATED 23 JUL 2020 AS AMENDED BY SPECIAL RESOLUTION REGISTERED AT COMPANIES HOUSE ON 04 NOV 2020 as amended on 15 Oct 2020 as amended on 15 Oct 2020 as amended on 04 Mar 2021
Charitable objects
Serving the wards of Easton and Lawrence Hill, particularly the neighbourhoods of Easton, Lawrence Hill, Old Market, St Judes, Newtown, Whitehall, Greenbank, Redfield, The Dings and Barton Hill, the Objects for which the charity is established are: 1) Advancement of citizenship and community development through the promotion of civic participation, volunteering, and community capacity building. 2) Provision of community services and facilities with the objective of inspiring agency, connecting people, creating opportunities and improving the condition of life for residents. 3) Specifically provide services and facilities, including an adventure playground, for children and young people: a) of which such children and young people have need by reason of their age or social and economic circumstances; and b) which will improve the conditions of childhood for such children and young people by promoting their health and well-being.
Area of benefit
BRISTOL , IN PARTICULAR IN EASTON, BARTON HILL, OLD MARKET, ST JUDES, NEWTOWN, WHITEHALL, GREENBANK, REDFIELD, LAWRENCE HILL AND THE DINGS.
Contact information
- Address:
-
EASTON COMMUNITY CENTRE
KILBURN STREET
BRISTOL
BS5 6AW
- Phone:
- 01179541409
- Email:
- contact@upourstreet.org.uk
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window