ALSAGERS BANK CRICKET AND RECREATION CLUB

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
Description of the Charity Activities are very much in-keeping with the criteria stipulated in the Classification Section and the Trusts Governing Document.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

11 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Amateur Sport
- Economic/community Development/employment
- Children/young People
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Staffordshire
Governance
- 07 August 2001: Standard registration
No other names
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
11 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
SARAH GLOVER | Trustee | 02 August 2018 |
|
|
||||
TIM MAIDEN | Trustee | 26 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
LEE JONES | Trustee | 26 August 2015 |
|
|
||||
LEONARD GATER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
KEITH JONES | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
CHRISTOPHER ROYALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP REGINALD FRYER | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
PHILIP BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JOHN BAILEY | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
MARTIN ROYALL | Trustee |
|
|
|||||
JULIE MAIDEN | Trustee |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £13.83k | £24.01k | £21.62k | £15.28k | £12.36k | |
|
Total expenditure | £3.26k | £3.26k | £14.25k | £4.30k | £9.83k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | £12.69k | £8.38k | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 15 October 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 31 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 30 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | Not Required | ||
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 19 November 2020 | 19 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | Not Required |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 14 JUNE 2001
Charitable objects
1) THE TRUSTEES SHALL HOLD THE TRUST FUND AND ITS INCOME UPON TRUST TO APPLY THEM FOR THE FOLLOWING OBJECTS IN THE PARISH OF AUDLEY. OBJECTIVES:- 2) TO PROMOTE FOR THE BENEFIT OF THE INHABITANTS OF ALSAGERS BANK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD WITHOUT DISTINCTION OF SEX AGE SEXUAL ORIENTATION RACE RELIGION OR OTHER OPINIONS BY ASSOCIATING TOGETHER WITH THE SAID INHABITANTS AND THE LOCAL AUTHORITIES VOLUNTARY AND OTHER ORGANISATIONS IN A COMMON EFFORT TO ADVANCE EDUCATION AND TO PROVIDE FACILITIES IN THE INTEREST OF SOCIAL WELFARE FOR RECREATION AND LEISURE TIME OCCUPATION WITH THE OBJECT OF IMPROVING THE CONDITIONS OF LIFE FOR THE SAID INHABITANTS. 3) ESTABLISH OR SECURE ESTABLISHMENT OF A COMMUNITY AND RECREATIONAL CENTRE AND TO MAINTAIN AND MANAGE SAME (WHETHER ALONE OR IN CO-OPERATION WITH ANY LOCAL AUTHORITY BODY OR ORGANISATION OR PERSON(S) IN FURTHERANCE WITH THESE OBJECTIVES. 4) TO PROMOTE SUCH OTHER CHARITABLE PURPOSES MAY BE DETERMINED BY THE TRUSTEES FROM TIME TO TIME.
Area of benefit
ALSAGERS BANK AND THE NEIGHBOURHOOD
Contact information
- Address:
-
THE DRIVE
ALSAGERS BANK
NEWCASTLE UNDER LYME
STAFFORDSHIRE
ST7 8BB
- Phone:
- 01782723770
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window