WINDSOR & MAIDENHEAD CROSSROADS LIMITED
Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
The primary objectives of the charity are, for the public benefit, to relieve the stresses experienced by carers and people with physical, mental or sensory impairment within the family or home by offering a respite service through the provision of community based care attendants.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2013
Fundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- The Advancement Of Health Or Saving Of Lives
- Disability
- Children/young People
- Elderly/old People
- People With Disabilities
- Provides Services
- Windsor And Maidenhead
Governance
- 22 June 2000: Standard registration
- 02 February 2016: Removed (Ceased to exist)
- WINDSOR & MAIDENHEAD CROSSROADS (Working name)
- WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD CROSSROADS (Working name)
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2009 | 31/03/2010 | 31/03/2011 | 31/03/2012 | 31/03/2013 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £380.47k | £357.23k | £325.52k | £261.31k | £242.10k | |
|
Total expenditure | £358.50k | £363.24k | £330.27k | £325.14k | £285.62k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2015 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2014 | Not submitted | ||
Annual return | 31 March 2013 | 20 January 2014 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2013 | 20 January 2014 | On Time | |
Annual return | 31 March 2012 | 18 January 2013 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2012 | 18 January 2013 | On Time |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
MEMORANDUM AND ARTICLES OF ASSOCIATION INCORPORATED ON 14 APRIL 2000.
Charitable objects
FOR THE PUBLIC BENEFIT, TO RELIEVE THE STRESSES EXPERIENCED BY CARERS AND PEOPLE WITH PHYSICAL, MENTAL AND SENSORY IMPAIRMENT WITHIN THE FAMILY OR HOME BY OFFERING A RESPITE SERVICE THROUGH THE PROVISION OF COMMUNITY BASED CARE ATTENDANTS AND, AT THE DISCRETION OF THE MANAGEMENT COMMITTEE AND IN EXCEPTIONAL CIRCUMSTANCES, TO PROVIDE SUCH CARE ATTENDANTS FOR DISABLED PEOPLE LIVING ALONE. THE AREA OF BENEFIT SHALL BE THE COUNTY OF THE ROYAL BOROUGH OF WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD.
Area of benefit
WINDSOR AND MAIDENHEAD.
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window