Financial history NETZACH YISRAEL TRUST

Charity number: 1086142
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/03/2020 31/03/2021 31/03/2022 31/03/2023 31/03/2024
Total gross income £48.46k £42.35k £50.35k £176.44k £44.27k
Total expenditure £49.12k £41.18k £45.15k £69.14k £54.60k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A