NETZACH YISRAEL TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
THE PRINCIPAL ACTIVITIES OF THE COMPANY ARE THE OPERATION OF A SYNAGOGUE AND COMMUNAL STUDY CENTRE.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 March 2024
People

3 Trustee(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No employees have total benefits over £60k for this charityFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- Education/training
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- Religious Activities
- People Of A Particular Ethnic Or Racial Origin
- Other Defined Groups
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Provides Buildings/facilities/open Space
- Provides Services
- Throughout England
Governance
- 12 April 2001: Standard registration
- NETZACH YISRAEL TRUST (Working name)
- Financial reserves policy and procedures
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Risk management
- Safeguarding policy and procedures
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
3 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
YOSEF AHIEL | Trustee | 01 March 2021 |
|
|
||||
Yossi Levi | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
||||
Elad Asnafi | Trustee | 23 October 2013 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/03/2020 | 31/03/2021 | 31/03/2022 | 31/03/2023 | 31/03/2024 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £48.46k | £42.35k | £50.35k | £176.44k | £44.27k | |
|
Total expenditure | £49.12k | £41.18k | £45.15k | £69.14k | £54.60k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2024 | 21 January 2025 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 187 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2023 | 05 August 2024 | 187 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2022 | 16 September 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2022 | 228 days late | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2021 | 16 September 2022 | 228 days late | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 March 2020 | 24 November 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
DECLARATION OF TRUST DATED 10TH FEBRUARY 2000
Charitable objects
(1) THE ADVANCEMENT OF THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION (2) THE RELIEF OF POVERTY (3) THE ADVANCEMENT OF RELIGIOUS EDUCATION IN THE ORTHODOX JEWISH RELIGION (4) SUCH OTHER EXCLUSIVELY CHARITABLE PURPOSES AS THE TRUSTEES AT THEIR DISCRETION SHALL DECIDE.
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
22 Selborne Gardens
LONDON
NW4 4SJ
- Phone:
- 02084557725
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window