Financial history THE SAKYA THUBTEN LING TIBETAN BUDDHIST CENTRE (UK)

Charity number: 1080967
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 30/09/2020 30/09/2021 30/09/2022 30/09/2023 30/09/2024
Total gross income £6.19k £6.03k £5.39k £5.00k £6.55k
Total expenditure £5.90k £8.46k £6.61k £5.00k £4.71k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A