RHODI CHARITABLE TRUST

Charity overview
Activities - how the charity spends its money
To donate funds to support organisations/institutions which provide religious or otherwise educations including to poor and needy children; To donate funds to support organisations/bodies which advance religion or provide public services; Support and provide funds to organisations/institutions which relieve sickness and preserve and protect good health; To relieve poverty.
Income and expenditure
Data for financial year ending 31 December 2023
People

5 Trustee(s)
2 Volunteer(s)
Employees with total benefits over £60,000
No information availableFundraising
Trading
Trustee payments
What, who, how, where
- General Charitable Purposes
- The Prevention Or Relief Of Poverty
- The General Public/mankind
- Makes Grants To Individuals
- Makes Grants To Organisations
- Throughout England And Wales
- Dubai
- India
Governance
- 18 October 2000: Standard registration
- RHODI FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST 1 FISHWICK PARK PRESTON PR1 4LZ (Working name)
- RHODI FAMILY CHARITABLE TRUST (Previous name)
- Complaints handling
- Conflicting interests
- Internal charity financial controls policy and procedures
- Investment
- Risk management
- Safeguarding vulnerable beneficiaries
Trustees
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
5 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
Asif Bux | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Rizwan Bux | Trustee | 17 April 2024 |
|
|
||||
Firoz Ibrahim Bux | Trustee | 27 March 2023 |
|
|||||
HAMIDA BUX | Trustee | 24 February 2000 |
|
|
||||
IBRAHIM VALI BUX | Trustee | 24 February 2000 |
|
|
Financial history
Financial period end date
Income / Expenditure | 31/12/2019 | 31/12/2020 | 31/12/2021 | 31/12/2022 | 31/12/2023 | ||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
|
Total gross income | £181.40k | £151.63k | £146.35k | £142.41k | £340.45k | |
|
Total expenditure | £159.04k | £147.07k | £120.67k | £113.37k | £398.05k | |
|
Income from government contracts | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | |
|
Income from government grants | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A | N/A |
Accounts and annual returns
Title | Reporting year | Date received | Received | Download |
---|---|---|---|---|
Annual return | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2023 | 30 October 2024 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2022 | 28 April 2023 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2021 | 12 October 2022 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2020 | 29 October 2021 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Annual return | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | |
Accounts and TAR | 31 December 2019 | 28 October 2020 | On Time | Download Open in new window |
Governing document
It is not the full text of the charity's governing document.
TRUST DEED DATED 24/02/2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 06/10/2000 AS AMENDED BY DEED DATED 10/04/2013
Charitable objects
SUCH CHARITABLE PURPOSES AND TO MAKE DONATIONS TO SUCH CHARITABLE INSTITUTIONS AT SUCH TIME AND IN SUCH MANNER AS THE TRUSTEES MAY IN THEIR ABSOLUTE DISCRETION FROM TIME TO TIME DETERMINE
Area of benefit
NOT DEFINED
Contact information
- Address:
-
1 Fishwick Park
Mercer St
Preston
PR1 4LZ
- Phone:
- 01772562288
- Email:
- No information available
- Website:
-
No information available
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.
Thank you for your feedback. Do you have 5 minutes to tell us what you think of this service?Open in new window