Financial history BRIGHT HORIZONS

Charity Number: 1080949
Removed charity
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2015 31/08/2016 31/08/2017 31/08/2018 31/08/2019
Total gross income £21.92k £19.26k £24.31k £17.52k £20.37k
Total expenditure £24.58k £19.96k £18.99k £20.12k £20.97k
Income from government contracts £0 £0 £0 £0 N/A
Income from government grants £0 £0 £0 £14.03k £16.79k