Financial history PORTOBELLO ORCHESTRA

Charity number: 1081212
Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
" role="img"> Text alternative for this canvas graphic is in the data table below.

Financial period end date

Income / Expenditure 31/08/2020 31/08/2021 31/08/2022 31/08/2023 31/08/2024
Total gross income £8.91k £3.46k £7.91k £11.02k £11.35k
Total expenditure £9.22k £3.33k £10.87k £10.41k £9.46k
Income from government contracts N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A
Income from government grants N/A N/A N/A N/A N/A