Trustees PORTOBELLO ORCHESTRA
Charity number: 1081212

Charity reporting is up to date (on time)
Trustees are the people responsible for controlling the work, management and administration of the charity on behalf of its beneficiaries. Generally trustees are treasurer, chair, board member etc. The trustees are responsible for keeping this list up to date and can do this by updating their details as they happen through the online service
6 Trustee(s)
Name | Role | Date of appointment | Other trusteeships | Reporting status of other trusteeships | ||||
---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|---|
DUNCAN FYFE GILLIES | Chair | 30 June 2011 |
|
|
||||
Imogen Bath | Trustee | 20 February 2023 |
|
|
||||
Rebecca Louise Pickavance | Trustee | 24 August 2021 |
|
|
||||
Philippa Hanscombe | Trustee | 01 May 2014 |
|
|
||||
CATHERINE WEBSTER | Trustee | 24 April 2013 |
|
|
||||
Jonathan Peters | Trustee | 22 May 2012 |
|
|
Save and Close
Tell us whether you accept cookies
We use cookies to collect information about how you use your Charity Commission Account, such as pages you visit.
We use this information to better understand how you use our website so that we can improve your user experience and present more relevant content.